MD SB913 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Washington County to use the proceeds from the issuance of specified bonds for specified purposes.
Title
Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209 |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-04-08 | House | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2015-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Bridges and Tunnels
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Economic and Community Development
Parking
Public Buildings and Facilities
Revenue and Taxes
Washington County
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Economic and Community Development
Parking
Public Buildings and Facilities
Revenue and Taxes
Washington County