MD SB898 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a credit grantor that makes a specified installment loan secured by a lien on a motor vehicle to a consumer borrower to require the consumer borrower to pay a balloon payment at maturity of the installment loan if the loan exceeds $30,000.
Title
Credit Regulation - Installment Loans Secured by Motor Vehicle Lien - Balloon
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-20 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (45-1) | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (43-3) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-02-19 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-19 | Re-referred Finance | |
2010-02-15 | First Reading Senate Rules |