MD SB896 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Rereferred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Rereferred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Independent Investigative Unit in the Office of the Attorney General to be the Independent Investigations Division; authorizing the Attorney General or certain designated individuals to seek certain injunctive relief or issue a certain subpoena under certain circumstances; authorizing the Division or a certain State's Attorney to prosecute a police officer under certain circumstances; requiring the Governor to include an appropriation of $5,000,000 for the Division in fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter; etc.
Title
State Government - Attorney General - Independent Investigations Division
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (25-21) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted (28-18) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {123822/1 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {123822/1 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Appropriations
Attorney General
Budgets
Death
Evidence
Hearings
Injury
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Police Conduct
Public Safety
Records
Reports
State's Attorneys
Subpoenas
Attorney General
Budgets
Death
Evidence
Hearings
Injury
Investigations and Inquiries
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Police Conduct
Public Safety
Records
Reports
State's Attorneys
Subpoenas
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 527 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 106.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |