MD SB894 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing an individual to notify the local department of social services or the appropriate law enforcement agency if the individual has reason to believe that a verbal threat of imminent severe bodily harm or death to a child has been made by the child's parent or a person who has permanent or temporary care or custody or responsibility for supervision of the child and that the child is at a high risk of child abuse; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateHearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-25SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-22SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback