MD SB891 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Institute at the University of Maryland to conduct a study to identify methods to improve the Maryland Transit Administration's ADA MobilityLink paratransit service; authorizing the Governor to include in the fiscal year 2026 budget bill an appropriation of at least $150,000 for the study; and requiring the Institute to submit a report on its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the General Assembly, certain elected officials, and a certain department by July 1, 2025.
Title
Transportation - MobilityLink Paratransit Service Improvements - Study
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2024-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {843227/1 Adopted |
2024-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {583621/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1199 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Subjects
Accessibility - see also- Blind; Deaf; DevDisPer; PhysDisPer
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Governor
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Mass Transit
Physically Disabled Persons
Reports
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Governor
Intergovernmental Cooperation
Mass Transit
Physically Disabled Persons
Reports
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally