MD SB890 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Abortion Care Clinical Training Program in the Maryland Department of Health to ensure that there are a sufficient number of health professionals to provide abortion care; establishing the Abortion Care Clinical Training Program Fund; establishing certain requirements regarding abortion services, including provision and coverage requirements, for certain entities and persons; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $3,500,000 to the Program; etc.
Title
Abortion Care Access Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 503424/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 133228/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 493629/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 593122/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 503729/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 683728/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 463720/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 513425/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 19 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 933725/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 683421/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Gallion) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 503424/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 133228/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 493629/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 593122/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 503729/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 683728/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 463720/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 513425/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 19 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 933725/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Floor Amendment 683421/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Senate - Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Gallion) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-29 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-14) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment {503424/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (16-29) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment {133228/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-29) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment {493629/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (17-27) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment {593122/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-28) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment {503729/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (18-27) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment {683728/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (16-30) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment {463720/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-30) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment {513425/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (19-27) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment {933725/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (17-28) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Floor Amendment {683421/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-31) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted (31-16) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Gallion) Rejected (16-30) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {543627/1 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {543627/1 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB937 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 56
Subjects
Abortion
Appropriations
Budgets
Comptroller
Disclosure
Governor
Health - Insurance
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Insurance Administration
Interest
Job Training
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appropriations
Budgets
Comptroller
Disclosure
Governor
Health - Insurance
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Insurance Administration
Interest
Job Training
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Treasurers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 13 | 4401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 13 | 4407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 20 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 857 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 31 | 122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |