MD SB889 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on private property during the bow hunting season from the first Sunday in October through the second Sunday in January the following year, inclusive, in Dorchester County, subject to certain provisions of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-9) (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 191
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (130-9)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-28HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {614136/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07SenateHearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
2019-03-07SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-26SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback