MD SB886 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-05 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-05 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, except under specified circumstances, a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from requiring, attempting to require, coercing, or attempting to coerce a dealer to purchase specified goods or services from specified vendors; requiring a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch licensed in the State to specify in writing to its motor vehicle dealers information relating to the compensation of dealers for parts and labor; establishing requirements for the compensation of dealers with respect to parts and labor; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {708677/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Fines
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Salaries
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Warranties
Work, Labor and Employment
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Salaries
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Warranties
Work, Labor and Employment