MD SB885 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain employers employing certain interns a credit against the State income tax that may not exceed $1,000 for each eligible intern or 10% of the wages paid to each eligible intern, subject to certain limitations; requiring a certain employer to enter into a certain agreement with a certain higher education institution; providing that not more than $300,000 in tax credit certificates may be issued in any taxable year; requiring a report by the Comptroller on utilization of the tax credit by July 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Employers - Eligible Internships
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Comptroller
Higher Education
Income Tax
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Students
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment
Higher Education
Income Tax
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Students
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment