MD SB885 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding a medical laboratory, as defined by ยง 17-201 of the Health - General Article, from the definition of "contracting provider".
Title
Health - Administrative Service Provider Contracts - Contracting Provider
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-20 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-19 | Re-referred Finance | |
2010-02-15 | First Reading Senate Rules |