MD SB878 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission to study and make recommendations regarding the feasibility of a Medicaid buy-in program to expand the health care coverage choices available to individuals purchasing coverage; requiring the study to address certain matters related to a potential Medicaid buy-in program in the State; requiring the Commission to include the findings of the study in its annual report to be submitted to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2018; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission – Medicaid Buy–In Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2018-03-22HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-02HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-03-01SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-02-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {287170/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-02-21SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback