MD SB876 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, beginning January 1, 2025, the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide limited behavioral health services to individuals under the age of 18 years regardless of whether the individual has a behavioral health diagnosis; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to seek input from stakeholders in determining the limited behavioral health services to be covered.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Limited Behavioral Health Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1040 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-09 - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Awareness and Outreach
Counselors
Demographics
Gender Identity and Expression
Health
Medical Assistance
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Reports
Counselors
Demographics
Gender Identity and Expression
Health
Medical Assistance
Medical Testing and Diagnosis
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 15 | 141.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0876?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0876f.pdf |