MD SB866 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a certain consumer shall be deemed not to have agreed to enter into a certain consumer contract by electronic means or in electronic form under certain circumstances; providing the provisions of the Act do not apply to a consumer contract for a banking product or service that is subject to regulatory oversight by a state or federal financial regulatory authority; and defining certain terms.
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Electronic Transactions Act - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {407675/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |