MD SB864 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund to provide grants to local law enforcement agencies for salaries, training, and equipment to be used for the investigation and prosecution of Internet crimes against children, to support a specified task force and for grants to specified child advocacy centers; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2018 and annually thereafter, to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of not less than $2,000,000 to the Fund; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund - Establishment (Alicia's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Delegates Lierman, Haynes, and McKay |
2016-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senators Lee, Muse, and Ready |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2016-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {514866/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {618271/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Gaming
Grants
Interest
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Lottery
Minors
Public Safety
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Gaming
Grants
Interest
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Lottery
Minors
Public Safety
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Telecommunications and Information Technology