MD SB861 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the types of cases in which the State may appeal from a decision of a trial court; establishing the Maryland State Police Gun Center as a statewide firearms enforcement center for the tracking, screening, and vetting of all firearm crimes in the State; requiring the Center to create a statewide database to track certain information related to crimes committed with crime firearms; requiring the Commissioner of Correction to include in a certain report certain statistics related to the cost of living of inmates; etc.
Title
Crimes - Firearms and Inmates - Enforcement, Procedures, and Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - House - Floor Amendment 603927/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (Y: 47 N: 80 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - House - Floor Amendment 603927/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (Y: 47 N: 80 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142 |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-39) |
2022-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Report {473020/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Adopted (32-15) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {473020/1 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Moon and Williams) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Refuses Recede |
2022-04-11 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Moon and Williams) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Refuses Recede |
2022-04-11 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Lee and Bailey) |
2022-04-11 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2022-04-11 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Lee and Bailey) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2022-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-12) |
2022-04-09 | House | Floor Amendment {603927/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (47-80) |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {993824/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {223022/1 Adopted |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {223022/1 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Appeals
Appropriations
Budgets
Correction, Division of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Dealers
Demographics
Evidence
Guns
Law Enforcement
Prices
Public Safety
Reports
Search and Seizure
State Police, Department of
Violence
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appropriations
Budgets
Correction, Division of
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Dealers
Demographics
Evidence
Guns
Law Enforcement
Prices
Public Safety
Reports
Search and Seizure
State Police, Department of
Violence
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 12 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 3 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 3 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |