MD SB859 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 752
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain State employees may be entitled to parental leave with pay; establishing a maximum of 60 days of parental leave that employees may use for the care and nurturing of a child immediately following the birth or adoption of the child; requiring certain State agencies to provide an employee with additional paid leave to attain 60 days of parental leave if the employee's available amount of accrued annual leave, sick leave, and personal leave is less than 60 days; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Employees – Parental Leave

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-10) (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-40) (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {743028/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (47-91) (Y: 48 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-41) (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-11) (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 752
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (100-40)
2018-04-09HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (34-10)
2018-04-09SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-09HouseDelegates A. Miller, Korman, and Vogt
2018-04-09HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-09HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2018-04-09SenateSenators Astle, Reilly, and Klausmeier
2018-04-09SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-09SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2018-04-09SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (96-41)
2018-04-04HouseFloor Amendment {743028/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (47-91)
2018-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {114467/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-29HouseHearing canceled
2018-04-03HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (36-11)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {987378/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Hough) Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {987378/1
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-02-15SenateHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0859&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0859f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0859t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0859e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_752_sb0859e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0859_98737801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0859_11446701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0859_74302801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0859_13352701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0859_17332301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0859.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0859_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0683.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0859_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1041.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1042.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0859_17332301.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1472.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1541.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback