MD SB856 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an electric company to provide to a retail electricity customer on request the historic usage and billing information for not less than the preceding 12 months; and providing that the electric company must make the information available, as requested by the customer, either on the company's website, electronically to the customer in a PDF format, or sent to the customer's billing address.
Title
Electric Companies - Billing Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB842 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
internet
Notices
Postal Service
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
internet
Notices
Postal Service
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |