MD SB854 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a certain process for valuing a water company or a sewage disposal company that is the subject of a certain acquisition; prohibiting a person from acquiring a controlling interest in certain water services or sewage disposal providers without prior approval of the Public Service Commission; providing the Commission may authorize a certain acquisition if the Commission finds that it is consistent with the public convenience and necessity; establishing a process to determine the fair market value of the selling utility; etc.
Title
Public Utilities – Water and Sewage Disposal Companies – Acquisition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-04-04 | House | Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Davis) Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2018-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {737576/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {737576/1 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Appraisals
Assessments
Commerce and Business
Construction
Fees
Mergers and Acquisitions
Prices
Public Service Commission
Sewage
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Water
Assessments
Commerce and Business
Construction
Fees
Mergers and Acquisitions
Prices
Public Service Commission
Sewage
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Water