MD SB854 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring individuals to register and be approved by the State Board of Pharmacy before practicing pharmacy as a pharmacy intern under the direct supervision of a licensed pharmacist; defining "direct supervision" to mean that a licensed pharmacist is physically available, nothwithstanding appropriate breaks, on-site and in the prescription area or in an area where pharmacy services are provided to supervise the practice of pharmacy; requiring registered pharmacy interns to submit to a criminal history records check; etc.
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Registered Pharmacy Interns
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {116787/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appeals
Apprentices
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Drugs
Education
Examinations
Fees
Fingerprinting
Forms
Fraud
Health Occupations
Identification
Job Training
Judicial Review
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Privacy
Records
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Work, Labor and Employment
Apprentices
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Drugs
Education
Examinations
Fees
Fingerprinting
Forms
Fraud
Health Occupations
Identification
Job Training
Judicial Review
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Privacy
Records
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Work, Labor and Employment