MD SB854 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum and mandatory minimum penalties for a person convicted of rape in the second degree of a child under the age of 13 years; increasing the maximum and mandatory minimum penalties for a person convicted of a sexual offense in the second degree against a child under the age of 13 years; altering requirements relating to the registration on a specified registry of individuals who have committed specified sex offenses; etc.
Title
Crimes - Sex Offenders - Notification, Registration, and Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | |
2010-04-08 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Delegates Dumais, Waldstreicher, and Frank | |
2010-04-01 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-01 | House Refuses to Recede | |
2010-03-30 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) | |
2010-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2010-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-03 | Senators Brochin, Haines, and Raskin | |
2010-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-03 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2010-04-03 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-03-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Rejected | |
2010-03-26 | Floor Committee Amendment (Judicial Proceedings) Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Special Order later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Special Order 3/26 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Substitute Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Committee Amendment Withdrawn | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-19 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-19 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Attorney General
Child Care
Committees and Commissions
Computers
Correction, Division of
Counties
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Evidence
Ex-Offenders
Examinations
Genetics
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Identification
Indigent Persons
International Affairs
Interstate Affairs
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Liability
Local Government Mandates
Mental Health
Minors
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State Hospitals
State`s Attorneys
Telecommunications
Trials
Witnesses
Child Care
Committees and Commissions
Computers
Correction, Division of
Counties
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Evidence
Ex-Offenders
Examinations
Genetics
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Identification
Indigent Persons
International Affairs
Interstate Affairs
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Liability
Local Government Mandates
Mental Health
Minors
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Public Schools
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State Hospitals
State`s Attorneys
Telecommunications
Trials
Witnesses