MD SB853 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB266
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish the Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program on or before July 1, 2021, for administration of a voluntary certificate program for ethical special education advocates; specifying qualifications and application procedures for a certificate; requiring the Department to issue a certificate to a certain applicant; authorizing an applicant to petition for judicial review of a decision of the Department that relates to issuing or renewing a certificate; etc.
Title
Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB853 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1595 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1595 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Age
Certifications
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Fees
Forms
Identification
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Special Education
Time
Volunteers
Certifications
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Fees
Forms
Identification
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Special Education
Time
Volunteers
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0853?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0853f.pdf |