MD SB85 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs, subject to the availability of funding, to establish a network of neighborhood-based centers providing immigrant services, assist law enforcement in combatting crimes against immigrants, and promote civic and economic participation among immigrants; requiring the Director to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 15 each year describing calls received by the Office, the number of immigrants assisted, and all other relevant information; etc.
Title
Creating Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-34) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {984935/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
2020-10-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB15 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Discrimination
Education
Federal Government
Fraud
Immigrants and Citizenship
internet
Interstate Affairs
Job Training
Language
Law Enforcement
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telephones
Work, Labor, and Employment
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Discrimination
Education
Federal Government
Fraud
Immigrants and Citizenship
internet
Interstate Affairs
Job Training
Language
Law Enforcement
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telephones
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 3301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |