MD HB15 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs, subject to the availability of funding, to create a network of neighborhood-based centers providing immigrant services, assist law enforcement in combatting crimes against immigrants, and promote civic and economic participation among immigrant communities; requiring the Director to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 15 each year describing calls received by the Office, the number of immigrants assisted and all other relevant information; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Governor's Office of Immigrant Affairs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (101-38)
2021-04-12HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (30-14)
2021-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {594735/1 Adopted
2021-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-19SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
2021-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (102-31)
2021-03-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-18HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2021-01-11HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2020-10-09HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB85 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government93301(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government93302(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government93303(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government93304(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback