MD SB844 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to hunt deer under a Deer Management Permit on any Sunday throughout the year, including all deer hunting seasons; altering the application of specified provisions of law governing Deer Management Permits in Charles County and St. Mary's County; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Deer Management Permits
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |