MD SB836 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Dental Examiners to study and make recommendations on certain matters; and requiring the Board to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2021, its findings and recommendations regarding necessary revisions to the disciplinary process and actions of the State Board of Dental Examiners to improve the process of disciplining dentists in the State.
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners Disciplinary Process and Actions Report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {326588/1 Adopted |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {644338/1 Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Arbitration
Auditors and Audits
Certifications
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Court Orders
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Discipline
Disclosure
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Governor
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Inspections
Insurance
internet
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Judgments
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Medical Assistance
Medical Malpractice
Medical Schools
Notices
Privacy
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reports
Safety
Secretary of State
State Employees
Testimony
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Auditors and Audits
Certifications
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Court Orders
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Discipline
Disclosure
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Governor
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Inspections
Insurance
internet
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Judgments
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Medical Assistance
Medical Malpractice
Medical Schools
Notices
Privacy
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reports
Safety
Secretary of State
State Employees
Testimony
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 4 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 323 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |