MD SB834 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide services provided by a residential service agency that has a certain license and is accredited by the Joint Commission on Home Care.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of Residential Service Agency Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |