MD SB829 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 to authorize the matching fund requirements of specified grants for the Dundalk Youth Services Arts Center to include real property; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Baltimore County - Dundalk Youth Services Arts Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Baltimore County
Community Facilities and Services
Municipal Corporations
Prior Authorizations
State Bonds
Baltimore County
Community Facilities and Services
Municipal Corporations
Prior Authorizations
State Bonds