MD SB826 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a public body take specified actions if the State Open Meetings Law Compliance Board determines that a violation of the Open Meetings Act has occurred; providing that compliance with specified provisions of the Act is not an admission to a specified violation and may not be used as evidence in a specified proceeding; repealing a prohibition on the introduction of opinions issued by the Board as evidence in specified proceedings; increasing the penalties for violations of the Open Meetings Act; etc.
Title
Open Meetings Act - Violations and Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {814438/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Courts
Evidence
Fines
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Signatures
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Courts
Evidence
Fines
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Public Information
Signatures
State Government - Regulations and Procedures