MD SB822 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Communities for a Lifetime Program within the Department of Aging; requiring the Secretary of Aging, with the advice of the Innovations in Aging Services Advisory Council, to include provisions for funding grants sought by Communities for a Lifetime within an Innovations for Aging Services Program plan in a specified manner; requiring the Department to collect and make available best practices on policies to encourage aging-in-place; etc.
Title
Maryland Communities for a Lifetime Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-19 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-06 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2011-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-18 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-18 | Re-referred Finance | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Aging, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Elderly Persons
Grants
Health
Housing
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Elderly Persons
Grants
Health
Housing
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Reports
Sports and Recreation
Transportation
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning