MD SB820 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Spay/Neuter Fund within the Department of Agriculture; stating the purpose of the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; requiring the Department to establish a specified fee on commercial feed prepared and distributed for consumption by dogs or cats and deposit the revenue into the Fund; authorizing the Fund to be used to establish a competitive grant program to support the provision of spay/neuter services; etc.
Title
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-25) (Y: 113 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-25) |
2013-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {844730/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Education
Fees
Food
Grants
Health
Municipal Corporations
Rabies
Registration
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Veterinarians
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Education
Fees
Food
Grants
Health
Municipal Corporations
Rabies
Registration
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Veterinarians