MD SB820 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to provide an opportunity for public review and comment on a proposal to increase tolls, fees, mileage rate ranges, pricing periods, toll zones, or other charges on any part of specified transportation facilities projects in a specified manner before the Authority adopts the proposal; requiring the authority to provide to the public specified information and studies in a specified manner; requiring the Authority to provide the public with an opportunity for written comments; etc.
Title
Transportation - Toll, Fee, or Other Charge Increases - Required Procedures
Sponsors
Sen. David Brinkley [R] | Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Joseph Getty [R] | Sen. Barry Glassman [R] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. E.J. Pipkin [R] | Sen. Christopher Shank [R] | Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (121-0) | |
2012-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-14 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-14 | Substitute Committee Amendment (Finance) 797975/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-14 | Committee Amendment Withdrawn | |
2012-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments 577071/1 | |
2012-03-13 | Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments 577071/1 | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bridges and Tunnels
Electronic Government
Fees
Highways
Notices
Public Information
Transportation
Bridges and Tunnels
Electronic Government
Fees
Highways
Notices
Public Information
Transportation