MD SB82 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2021, the sale or distribution, through a retail establishment, of any paint or coating removal product that contains N-Methylpyrrolidone or methylene chloride, also known as dichloromethane, for noncommercial use; and establishing that a person that violates the provision or certain regulations adopted to carry out the provision will incur a warning for a first offense, a civil penalty of $500 for the second offense, and a civil penalty of $1,000 for subsequent offenses.
Title
Public Health - Sale and Distribution of Products Containing NMP and DCM - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {987172/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Safety
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Retail Sales
Safety