MD SB813 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Decreasing the maximum homestead property tax credit percentage in Baltimore County from 110% to 103%; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homestead Tax Credit Percentage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |