MD SB811 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (115-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (115-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public or private water or sewer system that serves 10,000 or more users and receives financial assistance from the State to assess its vulnerability to a cyber attack; authorizing the Maryland Water Quality Financing Administration to provide financial assistance to a public water or wastewater system to assess system cybersecurity vulnerabilities and develop a cybersecurity plan; establishing the Local Cybersecurity Support Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; altering the duties of the Secretary of Information Technology; etc.
Title
State Government - Information Technology and Cybersecurity-Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-15) |
2022-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {613721/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-04-11 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
2022-04-09 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {393321/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1205 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Subjects
Appropriations
Bonds
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Cybersecurity
Information Technology - Generally
Information Technology, Department of
Interest
Notices
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Revenue and Taxes
Stadium Authority
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Bonds
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Cybersecurity
Information Technology - Generally
Information Technology, Department of
Interest
Notices
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Revenue and Taxes
Stadium Authority
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 104.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |