MD HB1205 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a public or private water or sewer system that serves 10,000 or more users and receives financial assistance from the State to, on or before a certain date, assess its vulnerability to a cyber attack, develop a cybersecurity plan if appropriate, and submit a certain report to the General Assembly; authorizing the Maryland Water Quality Financing Administration to provide financial assistance to a public water or wastewater system to assess system cybersecurity vulnerabilities and develop a cybersecurity plan; etc.
Title
State Government – Information Technology and Cybersecurity–Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-19 - House - Floor Amendment 513224/1 (Delegate Novotny) Rejected (Y: 34 N: 90 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-19 - House - Floor Amendment 403125/1 (Delegate Novotny) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 90 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 16 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-19 - House - Floor Amendment 513224/1 (Delegate Novotny) Rejected (Y: 34 N: 90 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-19 - House - Floor Amendment 403125/1 (Delegate Novotny) Rejected (Y: 37 N: 90 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {563327/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-4) |
2022-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Report {563327/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Griffith, Zucker and Salling) |
2022-04-11 | House | Senate Refuses Recede |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Griffith, Zucker and Salling) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Refuses Recede |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates P. Young, Rosenberg and Kipke) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2022-04-11 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates P. Young, Rosenberg and Kipke) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2022-04-11 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Floor Committee Amendment {803229/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {183627/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-27) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Floor Amendment {513224/1 (Delegate Novotny) Rejected (34-90) |
2022-03-19 | House | Floor Amendment {403125/1 (Delegate Novotny) Rejected (37-90) |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {303823/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB811 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (115-15)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Bonds
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Counties
Cybersecurity
Education, Boards of
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Governor
Information Technology - Generally
Information Technology, Department of
Interest
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Procurement
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Stadium Authority
State Aid
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Water
Appropriations
Bonds
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Counties
Cybersecurity
Education, Boards of
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Governor
Information Technology - Generally
Information Technology, Department of
Interest
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Procurement
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Stadium Authority
State Aid
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 14 | 104.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 12 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 15 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |