MD SB811 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor, based on the availability of certain federal funds, to include in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2022 a certain appropriation to the Unemployment Insurance Trust Fund; authorizing the appropriation to be used for certain administrative costs, including the repayment of certain federal funds; and requiring that the earned rate of contributions for calendar year 2023 be calculated using a certain table of unemployment insurance rates.
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution – Applicable Table of Rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/07 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {587071/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 8 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |