MD SB811 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting a specified security issued by an entity formed, organized, or existing under the laws of the State from specified registration and filing requirements under specified circumstances; and requiring a person required to submit a filing in accordance with a specified exemption to pay a specified fee for each filing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-24 - House of Delegates - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-20) (Y: 115 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 557
2014-04-01SenateReturned Passed
2014-03-31HouseThird Reading Passed (115-20)
2014-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed
2014-03-28HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2014-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2014-03-11HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2014-03-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2014-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {788075/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2014-02-20SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-31SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0811&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0811f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0811t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_557_sb0811t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0811_78807501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0811.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/sb0811_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/sb0811_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0811,s-0467&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0811,h-0882&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback