MD SB809 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Comptroller to include on the Maryland resident individual income tax return form a certain notification concerning the homeowners' property tax credit and a certain separate form that a taxpayer may use to apply for the homeowners' property tax credit; and requiring that certain qualifying homeowners receive the homeowners' property tax credit for subsequent taxable years without being required to file an application for the credit.
Title
Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Easy Application and Automatic Renewal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1138 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-14 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Auditors and Audits
Comptroller
Contracts
Elderly Persons
Forms
Liens
Notices
Property Tax
Records
Reports
Residential Property
Social Security
Tax Credits
Tax Returns
Taxes - Property
Auditors and Audits
Comptroller
Contracts
Elderly Persons
Forms
Liens
Notices
Property Tax
Records
Reports
Residential Property
Social Security
Tax Credits
Tax Returns
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 2 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 9 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0809?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0809f.pdf |