MD SB804 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person charged with reckless driving that contributes to an accident to appear in court and prohibiting the person from prepaying the fine.
Title
Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {428176/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Accidents
Agriculture
Animals
Bicycles
Courts
Death
Disabilities
Driver Education
Drivers' Licenses
Emergencies
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Public Employees
Sidewalks
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Utilities
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Agriculture
Animals
Bicycles
Courts
Death
Disabilities
Driver Education
Drivers' Licenses
Emergencies
Equipment
Fines
Highways
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Public Employees
Sidewalks
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Utilities
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road