MD SB804 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specified health care facility, on or before August 1, 2014, to establish a specified workplace violence prevention committee; requiring a workplace violence prevention committee, on or before October 1, 2014, to establish a specified workplace violence prevention program; requiring a workplace violence prevention program to include specified components; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, on or before July 1, 2014, to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Violence Prevention Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Rules and Regulations
Violence
Work, Labor and Employment
Education
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Rules and Regulations
Violence
Work, Labor and Employment