MD SB80 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a licensing and regulatory scheme to allow the commercial fishing of blue and flathead catfish in the tidal waters of the State using a finfish trotline.
Title
Natural Resources – Blue and Flathead Catfish Finfish Trotline License – Establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-06 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2022-09-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB386 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Time
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 4 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 701.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |