MD SB80 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revising and clarifying specified provisions of law relating to student financial assistance administered by the Office of Student Financial Assistance in the Maryland Higher Education Commission; repealing specified provisions relating to the enforcement of bonds given by scholarship recipients; authorizing rules or regulations adopted by the Office to include specified provisions relating to performance of a service obligation by a recipient of student financial assistance; etc.
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Office of Student Financial Assistance
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2010-02-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-05 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/20 at 2:45 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2009-11-04 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Bonds
Budgets
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Work, Labor and Employment
Bonds
Budgets
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Work, Labor and Employment