MD SB8 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a treatment plan for an individual with a mental disorder admitted to a certain health care facility to include a certain discharge goal and an estimate of the probable length of the inpatient stay the individual requires before transfer to a certain setting; requiring certain facility staff to review and reassess a plan of treatment; establishing an appeals process related to the review of a treatment plan; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to adopt certain regulations relating to the appeals process; etc.
Title
Mental Health - Treatment Plans for Individuals in Facilities and Residence Grievance System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-31 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {143429/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2022-10-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB121 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Subjects
Administrative Hearings, Office of
Appeals
Circuit Courts
Communications
Consumer Protection
Examinations
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Judges
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Patients
Public Health
State Hospitals
Appeals
Circuit Courts
Communications
Consumer Protection
Examinations
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Judges
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Patients
Public Health
State Hospitals
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 908 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |