MD SB8 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Comptroller or local governments to disburse specified grant funds from the Bay Restoration Fund directly to contractors who incur costs eligible for reimbursement under specified circumstances.
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Payments to Contractors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 a.m. | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2009-07-14 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0008.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0008f.pdf |