MD SB796 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain provision of law requiring the Maryland Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities to collaborate with the Maryland Health Care Commission to publish and provide a certain report card to require the report card to include the racial and ethnic composition of all individuals who hold a certain license or certificate, rather than only physicians; requiring the report card to include a comparison of certain information; etc.
Title
Maryland Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities and Maryland Health Care Commission – Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Certifications
Communications
Data
Demographics
Ethnic Affairs
Examinations
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Minorities
Public Health
Records
Reports
Time
Zoning and Planning
Certifications
Communications
Data
Demographics
Ethnic Affairs
Examinations
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Minorities
Public Health
Records
Reports
Time
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 1004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |