MD SB796 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing any rebates received by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene from the Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program to be used to provide specified services to eligible individuals under Part B of the federal Ryan White HIV/AIDS Program.
Title
Public Health - Maryland AIDS Drug Assistance Program - Expansion of Eligibility and Services - Pharmaceutical Rebate Coverage
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] |
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384 |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-04-07 | House | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
AIDS
Drugs
Federal Government
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Patients
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Drugs
Federal Government
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Patients
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes