MD SB793 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue or allow the transfer of a specified cumulative number of Class B beer, wine and liquor licenses into a specified area of the 46th District in Baltimore City, subject to specified limitations; requiring the Board to execute a specified memorandum of understanding between specified community associations and to enforce a specified memorandum of understanding for specified proposed actions before the Board issues or allows the transfer of a specified license; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {434936/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Contracts
Homeowners Associations
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Contracts
Homeowners Associations
License Commissioners, Boards of