MD SB791 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each county board of education to establish a certain policy to support certain goals and improve the educational outcomes of pregnant and parenting students, collect and track certain data, and, on or before June 1 each year, beginning in 2021, submit the data in a certain manner to the University of Maryland Institute for Innovation and Implementation; requiring the Institute to analyze the data and submit certain reports to the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2022, and June 30, 2024; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05SenateHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB1298 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education4138(n/a)See Bill Text
Education7301.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback