MD SB785 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to coordinate with certain entities to identify and implement certain language developmental milestones on or before July 1, 2021; requiring the Department to develop a certain parent resource that meets certain specifications on or before July 1, 2021; requiring the Statewide Coordinator to make a certain parent resource available or distribute certain milestones in a certain way; etc.
Title
Education - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Infants or Toddlers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Curriculum
Data
Deaf Persons
Disabilities
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Grants
Job Training
Language
Literacy
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Publications
Records
Reports
Social Services
Time
Communications
Curriculum
Data
Deaf Persons
Disabilities
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Grants
Job Training
Language
Literacy
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Publications
Records
Reports
Social Services
Time