MD SB782 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Stadium Authority and the University System of Maryland, by regulation, to establish certain procedures for each bidder, contractor, or subcontractor that performs work on certain construction projects to certify that the bidder, contractor, or subcontractor pays certain employee health care expenses; authorizing a certain bidder, contractor, or subcontractor to demonstrate the payment of certain employee health care expenses in a certain manner on or before July 1, 2021; etc.
Title
State Procurement - Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses - Revisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB583 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 264
Subjects
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Communications
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Forms
Health
Health Insurance
Labor, Department of
Medical Treatments
Prices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Stadium Authority
State Employees
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce and Business
Communications
Construction
Contractors
Contracts
Forms
Health
Health Insurance
Labor, Department of
Medical Treatments
Prices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Stadium Authority
State Employees
State Government - Procurement
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0782?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0782f.pdf |